Valle Arrizon et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Efren Valle Arrizon and Gonzalo Valle Arrizon
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Daniel Renaud, Unknown Jones, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mick Dedvukaj, Chad F. Wolf and Michael Klinger
Case Number: 1:2020cv00788
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #5 request for pre-motion conference; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jlg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071 ; Judge Janet T. Neff is no longer assigned to the case (asm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re #8 by plaintiffs Efren Valle Arrizon, Gonzalo Valle Arrizon (Asch, Marc)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: joint notice regarding consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge due not later than 9/23/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiffs Efren Valle Arrizon, Gonzalo Valle Arrizon #5 ; filed by Mick Dedvukaj, Chad F. Wolf, Michael Klinger, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Unknown Jones, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Daniel Renaud filed by Mick Dedvukaj, Chad F. Wolf, Michael Klinger, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Unknown Jones, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Daniel Renaud (Cobb, Ryan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed on All Defendants, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon local US Attorney 8/24/20; answers due 10/23/20 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (ems).
August 30, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiffs Efren Valle Arrizon, Gonzalo Valle Arrizon (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (pjw).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mick Dedvukaj, Unknown Jones, Michael Klinger, Daniel Renaud, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (clw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Asch, Marc)
August 21, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Efren Valle Arrizon, Gonzalo Valle Arrizon in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5599105 (Asch, Marc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Efren Valle Arrizon, Gonzalo Valle Arrizon (Asch, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valle Arrizon et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Renaud
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Dedvukaj
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Klinger
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Valle Arrizon
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Valle Arrizon
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?