Newberne v. Niagara Central Revenue, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donald Newberne
Defendant: Five Star Acquisition, Inc., Angela B. Giglia, Niagara Central Revenue, Inc., Jacalyn Ann Sessum, Robert T. Washington, Jr., Levark Recovery Management LLC, Keith M. Marshall, Gage P. Masich, M Property Restoration, LLC, M Property Holdings, LLC, Levon D. Masich and Levark Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00820
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; M Property Restoration, LLC served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020; Keith M. Marshall served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Niagara Central Revenue, Inc., Robert T. Washington, Jr. and Angela B. Giglia , with prejudice, filed by plaintiff Donald Newberne (Rogers, Phillip)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Levark Holdings, LLC, Levark Recovery Management LLC, M Property Holdings, LLC, M Property Restoration, LLC, Keith M. Marshall, Gage P. Masich, Levon D. Masich (ns)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #8 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Levark Recovery Management LLC, Levark Holdings, LLC, M Property Holdings, LLC, M Property Restoration, LLC, Levon D. Masich, Keith M. Marshall, Gage P. Masich filed by Donald Newberne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Rogers, Phillip)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Five Star Acquisition, Inc. and Jacalyn Ann Sessum without prejudice filed by plaintiff Donald Newberne (Rogers, Phillip)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Five Star Acquisition, Inc. served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020; Jacalyn Ann Sessum served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Angela B. Giglia served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020; Niagara Central Revenue, Inc. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020; Robert T. Washington, Jr served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Five Star Acquisition, Inc., Angela B. Giglia, Niagara Central Revenue, Inc., Jacalyn Ann Sessum, Robert T. Washington, Jr (ns)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
August 26, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Donald Newberne in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5618433 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Donald Newberne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newberne v. Niagara Central Revenue, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Star Acquisition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela B. Giglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Central Revenue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacalyn Ann Sessum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Washington, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levark Recovery Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith M. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gage P. Masich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Property Restoration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Property Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levon D. Masich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levark Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Newberne
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?