Newberne v. Sunset Solutions Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald Newberne
Defendant: Marion Franklin McIlwain, Blue Circle Asset Management LLC, Marion Franklin McIlwain, Jr., Retrievable Asset Solutions LLC, Sean Dion McIlwain, S & J Acquisitions LLC, Capital Asset Holdings Firm, LLC, Sunset Solutions Group, LLC and Stacey Larmingo Benjamin
Case Number: 1:2020cv00822
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER requiring appropriate closing documents to be submitted by 11/12/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Rogers, Phillip)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; S & J Acquisitions LLC served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Stacey Larmingo Benjamin served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Blue Circle Asset Management LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020; Marion Franklin McIlwain served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020; Retrievable Asset Solutions LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020; Sunset Solutions Group, LLC served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Sean Dion McIlwain served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 20-CA-060 that this case is reassigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Stacey Larmingo Benjamin, Blue Circle Asset Management LLC, Capital Asset Holdings Firm, LLC, Marion Franklin McIlwain, Sean Dion McIlwain, Retrievable Asset Solutions LLC, S & J Acquisitions LLC, Sunset Solutions Group, LLC (mg)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ndj)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Berens indicating that this case not related (ndj)
August 27, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Donald Newberne in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5621463 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Donald Newberne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newberne v. Sunset Solutions Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Franklin McIlwain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Circle Asset Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Franklin McIlwain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retrievable Asset Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Dion McIlwain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & J Acquisitions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Asset Holdings Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunset Solutions Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Larmingo Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Newberne
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?