T-Mobile USA Inc v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00893
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Washington Western, their case number 2:20-cv-00567; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
September 14, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER denying #28 Motion for Clarification of order re #27 Order on Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is DIRECTED to take steps necessary to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan, Southern Division at Lansing. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Defendant's motions to file over-length briefs (Dkt. Nos. #8 , #22 ). The Court GRANTS the relief as requested. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE, by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company, to #28 MOTION Clarification of order re #27 Order on Motion to Dismiss . (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION Clarification of order re #27 Order on Motion to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification) Noting Date 9/1/2020, (Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Case will be sent to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan, Southern Division at Lansing by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. (LH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Defendant's #12 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(LH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Eric A. Kekel filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Attorney Kelly H Sheridan added as counsel for T-Mobile USA Inc per #23 Notice of Appearance. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Maia R Robbins on behalf of Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc. (Robbins, Maia) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs , filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/12/2020, (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Lisa Bauer filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit C3, #6 Exhibit C4, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H)(Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Michael A. Moore filed by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff T-Mobile USA Inc, to #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE Re: LR 7-1 Certification re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue ; filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Attorney Joshua D Stadtler for Auto-Owners Insurance Company added; per #16 Notice of Attorney Association. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Eric A Kekel on behalf of Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Eric Musser filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Theresa Franks filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Eric A. Kekel filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 5/15/2020, (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #7 Verification of State Court Records AMENDED by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to attach document Amended Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs , filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/17/2020, (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 REDACTION to #3 Declaration (non motion), Exhibit 1 by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 16, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re #3 Declaration (non motion): Exhibit 1 (Verified Third-Party Bill of Particulars) contains personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (KB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 15, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/22/2020. (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 15, 2020 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Gregg Weinstock re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: SEALED DOCUMENT #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kekel, Eric) Modified on 4/16/2020 - Document contains personal identifiers. Document sealed pursuant to LCR 5.2. A redacted document will be filed by Counsel. (KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Theresa Franks re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kekel, Eric) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-06370-3-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6271229) Attorney Eric A Kekel added to party Auto-Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(Kekel, Eric) Modified to update payment receipt number on 4/14/2020 (STP). Modified on 4/15/2020 change exhibit A - to Complaint(SG). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Mobile USA Inc v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jocelyn J Whiteley
Represented By: Kelly H Sheridan
Represented By: Michael A Moore
Represented By: Maia R Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric A Kekel
Represented By: Joshua D Stadtler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?