Figures #538444 v. Becker et al
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Figures #538444, II
Defendant: Ryan Maesen, Christopher R. Becker, Case Weston and Kimberly A. Richardson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00909
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
2 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $62.32, receipt number GR072207; amount paid to date $62.32 (mkc)
October 15, 2020 Certified Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #7 , Opinion (Screening) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Wayne Figures #538444, II (mg)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT dismissing Plaintiff's federal claims for failure to state a claim and state claims because the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over them; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 OPINION; judgment to follow; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
September 30, 2020 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment (HYJ), #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Wayne Figures #538444, II (tlbu)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou under #Administrative Order No. 20-CA-071; District Judge Paul L. Maloney is no longer assigned to the case (jem)
September 23, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Wayne Figures #538444, II (mg)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $62.32 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; (initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 10/20/2020); signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff Larry Wayne Figures #538444, II re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 , APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 (mg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Christopher R. Becker, Ryan Maesen, Kimberly A. Richardson, Case Weston filed by Larry Wayne Figures #538444, II (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figures #538444 v. Becker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Maesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Figures #538444, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?