Baker v. Allegiant Management Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Baker
Defendant: Tanisha L. Skotarczak, Capital Currency Solutions LLC, Great Lakes Capital Management, LLC, SG Alliance, Inc., CGE Processing LLC, Allegiant Management Group LLC, Stephen P. Skotarczak, Tanisha L. Cline and Capital Currency Resolutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00933
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Gregory Baker (Rogers, Phillip)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Rogers, Phillip)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to respond to complaint extended to 11/6/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to respond to the Complaint by defendants Allegiant Management Group LLC, CGE Processing LLC, Capital Currency Resolutions, LLC, Capital Currency Solutions LLC, Great Lakes Capital Management, LLC, SG Alliance, Inc., Stephen P. Skotarczak, Tanisha L. Skotarczak (O'Brien, Sean)
October 27, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sean Michael O'Brien on behalf of defendants Allegiant Management Group LLC, CGE Processing LLC, Capital Currency Resolutions, LLC, Capital Currency Solutions LLC, Great Lakes Capital Management, LLC, SG Alliance, Inc., Stephen P. Skotarczak, Tanisha L. Skotarczak (O'Brien, Sean)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Capital Currency Resolutions, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Capital Currency Solutions LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Great Lakes Capital Management, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; SG Alliance, Inc. served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Stephen P. Skotarczak served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Tanisha L. Skotarczak served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Allegiant Management Group LLC, CGE Processing LLC, Capital Currency Resolutions, LLC, Capital Currency Solutions LLC, Great Lakes Capital Management, LLC, SG Alliance, Inc., Stephen P. Skotarczak, Tanisha L. Skotarczak (pjw)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
September 24, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Gregory Baker in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5727582 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gregory Baker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Allegiant Management Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanisha L. Skotarczak
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Currency Solutions LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGE Processing LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiant Management Group LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P. Skotarczak
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanisha L. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Currency Resolutions, LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Baker
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?