Election Integrity Fund et al v. Lansing, City of et al
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine, Election Integrity Fund and Jim Miraglia
Defendant: City of Flint, City of Lansing, Lansing, City of and Flint, City of
Case Number: 1:2020cv00950
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 02:437
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER accepting PROPOSED ORDER #31 ; response brief due by 12/4/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 10, 2020 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending Defendants Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by defendants Flint, City of, Lansing, City of (Trebilcock, Christopher)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal #20 filed granting motion to dismiss case - voluntarily ; no mandate to issue (ns)
November 5, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief - jury trial demanded against All Defendants filed by Jim Miraglia, Election Integrity Fund, Kirklyn Valentine, Linda Lee Tarver (Kaardal, Erick) Modified text on 11/6/2020 (ns).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal #20 filed denying appellants' Rule 8 motion for injunction (ns)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #21 motion for an injunction pending appeal; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #20 indicating that appeal has been docketed (ns)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Kaardal, Erick)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for Hearing #21 on Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Kaardal, Erick)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Hearing #21 on Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance) (Kaardal, Erick)
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE re #21 Notice of Hearing on Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Kaardal, Erick)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for hearing Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine; (Kaardal, Erick)
October 23, 2020 CASE NUMBER 20-2048 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #20 (mkc)
October 23, 2020 APPEAL FEE PAID re #20 by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine in the amount of $505, receipt number AMIWDC-5845099 (Kaardal, Erick)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #19 , #11 by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Kaardal, Erick)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #5 and PROPOSED ORDER #10 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 SECOND NOTICE re #15 Supplemental Authority by defendants Flint, City of, Lansing, City of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opinion and Order) (Sallan, Vincent) Modified text on 10/16/2020 (ns).
October 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory Stephen Venker on behalf of defendant Lansing, City of (Venker, Gregory)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion,,, #15 Certificate of Complaint for Word Count Regarding Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority Dkt #16 filed by Flint, City of, Lansing, City of (Trebilcock, Christopher)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE re #15 , #6 Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by defendants Flint, City of, Lansing, City of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 WI 0 2020-10-14 Order Denying TRO) (Trebilcock, Christopher) Modified text on 10/16/2020 (ns).
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO MOTION for temporary restraining order #5 filed by Flint, City of, Lansing, City of (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 CTCL Our Story, #3 Exhibit 2 CTCL Election Officials, #4 Exhibit 3 CTCL Our Work Civic Data, #5 Exhibit 4 CTCL Board of Directors, #6 Exhibit 5 CTCL Advisory Committee, #7 Exhibit 6 CTCL Statement on the Amistad Project, #8 Exhibit 7 CTCL Statement on the Amistad Project PDF, #9 Exhibit 8 Lansing Declaration, #10 Exhibit 0 Flint Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 SOS Emails Redacted, #12 Exhibit 11 City of Lansing Safe Voting Plan 2020, #13 Exhibit 12 City of Lansing Safe Voting Plan Amendment, #14 Exhibit 13 City of Flint Safe Voting Plan, #15 Word Count - Certificate of Compliance) (Trebilcock, Christopher)
October 12, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for TRO #5 Second Declaration of Erick G. Kaardal filed by Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L (part 1), #2 Exhibit L (part 2), #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N) (Kaardal, Erick)
October 12, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Erick G. Kaardal on behalf of plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Kaardal, Erick)
October 7, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Vincent Christopher Sallan on behalf of defendants Flint, City of, Lansing, City of (Sallan, Vincent)
October 7, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher M. Trebilcock on behalf of defendants Flint, City of, Lansing, City of (Trebilcock, Christopher)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; as to defendant Flint, City of (Northon, Ian) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (ns).
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; as to defendant Lansing, City of (Northon, Ian) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (ns).
October 5, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of F. Joseph Abood on behalf of defendant Lansing, City of (Abood, F.)
October 5, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Heather Elizabeth Sumner on behalf of defendant Lansing, City of (Sumner, Heather)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #5 motion for TRO and establishing briefing schedule; Response to motion for PI due no later than 10/13/220 by 5pm; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Northon, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of hearing at a date and time to be set by the Court re #5 by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine filed by Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Northon, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for TRO #5 filed by Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Northon, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Memorandum in Support of a Motion #6 filed by Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Northon, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for TRO #5 filed by Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine (Northon, Ian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine; (Northon, Ian)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Flint, City of, Lansing, City of (ns)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
September 29, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Election Integrity Fund, Jim Miraglia, Linda Lee Tarver, Kirklyn Valentine in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5745281 (Northon, Ian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Northon, Ian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jim Miraglia, Election Integrity Fund, Kirklyn Valentine, Linda Lee Tarver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Northon, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Election Integrity Fund et al v. Lansing, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lee Tarver
Represented By: Ian Alexander Northon
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirklyn Valentine
Represented By: Ian Alexander Northon
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Election Integrity Fund
Represented By: Ian Alexander Northon
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Miraglia
Represented By: Ian Alexander Northon
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lansing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing, City of
Represented By: Christopher M. Trebilcock
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Sumner
Represented By: F. Joseph Abood
Represented By: Vincent Christopher Sallan
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Venker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint, City of
Represented By: Christopher M. Trebilcock
Represented By: Vincent Christopher Sallan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?