Murphy v. M Micro Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Murphy
Defendant: M Micro Technologies, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2020cv00951
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting proposed stipulated order #28 ; this matter is dismissed with prejudice, and without costs or fees; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 4, 2021 Filing 28 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice and Without Costs to Any Party by plaintiff Jason Murphy (Edsenga, Patrick)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting STIPULATION #26 ; extending dismissal papers deadline to 5/4/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 20, 2021 Filing 26 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Dismissal Paperwork (3rd) by defendant M Micro Technologies, Inc. (Warner, Brent)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting STIPULATION #24 ; extending dismissal papers deadline to 4/20/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 5, 2021 Filing 24 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Dismissal Paperwork by plaintiff Jason Murphy (Edsenga, Patrick)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting STIPULATION #22 ; extending dismissal papers deadline to 4/6/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 19, 2021 Filing 22 PROPOSED JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Dismissal Paperwork by plaintiff Jason Murphy (Edsenga, Patrick) Modified text on 3/22/2021 (eod)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 3/22/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 18, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of facilitative mediation held 2/15/2021; mediation is Complete; case is Settled, closing documents to be filed by 30 days (Silver, Lee)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting STIPULATION #18 ; the deadline to complete mediation is extended until 2/15/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 10, 2020 Filing 18 CORRECTED PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Mediation Deadline by plaintiff Jason Murphy (Edsenga, Patrick) Modified text on 12/10/2020; this entry replaces #17 (ems).
December 9, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Mediation Deadline by plaintiff Jason Murphy (Edsenga, Patrick)
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Lee T. Silver ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 12/1/2020 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 12/1/2020 (lep)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Lee T. Silver ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 12/1/2020 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 12/1/2020 (lep)
November 24, 2020 SELECTION of Lee Silver as facilitative mediator per email from counsel (lep)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTES of pre-motion conference via video conference re #8 held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT by the Court (instructions for 11/12/20 pre-motion conference video hearing) [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for M Micro Technologies, Inc., Jason Murphy only] (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document number #8 : pre-motion conference via video conference is set for 11/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Janet T. Neff; counsel shall not appear in person; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant M Micro Technologies, Inc. #8 ; filed by Jason Murphy (Edsenga, Patrick) Modified text on 10/14/2020 (ems).
October 9, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James Richard Peterson on behalf of plaintiff Jason Murphy (Peterson, James)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting to an extent #5 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant M Micro Technologies, Inc. (Warner, Brent)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by defendant M Micro Technologies, Inc. (Warner, Brent)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #5 filed by M Micro Technologies, Inc. (Warner, Brent)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant M Micro Technologies, Inc.; (Warner, Brent)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT FILE received from Kent County Circuit Court (Register of Actions only) (ems)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M Micro Technologies, Inc. (Warner, Brent)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 20-03811-CBB filed by M Micro Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint (State Court), #2 Exhibit B: Rhode Island Dept. of State Business Services Division Record for Micro, #3 Exhibit C: Florida Division of Corporations Record for Micro) (Warner, Brent)
September 30, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant M Micro Technologies, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5750742 (Warner, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. M Micro Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Micro Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Brent William Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Murphy
Represented By: Patrick Michael Edsenga
Represented By: James Richard Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Lee T. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?