Dahmani v. JP Morgan Chase Bank
Plaintiff: Pierre Dahmani
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv00967
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting proposed stipulated order #6 ; Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 1/8/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER regarding time to respond to complaint by defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank (Magyar, Mark) Modified text on 12/2/2020 (eod).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting proposed stipulated order #4 ; Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 12/2/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Time to Respond to Complaint by defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank (Magyar, Mark)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Morgan Chase Bank identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank (Magyar, Mark)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
October 8, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5782884 (Magyar, Mark)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Manistee County Circuit Court case number 20-17137-CH filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Magyar, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahmani v. JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark John Magyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Mark John Magyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Dahmani
Represented By: Scott W. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?