Davis v. Benson et al
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Defendant: Detroit Department of Elections, Janice Winfrey, Jocelyn Benson and Brenda Green
Case Number: 1:2020cv00981
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Brenda Green (ems)
December 10, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #19 (Paterson, Andrew)
December 10, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #16 filed by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew) Modified text on 12/10/2020 (ems).
November 18, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #16 filed by Detroit Department of Elections, Janice Winfrey (Noseda, James)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #16 filed by Detroit Department of Elections, Janice Winfrey (Noseda, James)
November 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Detroit Department of Elections, Janice Winfrey; (Noseda, James)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed; Detroit Department of Elections served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Janice Winfrey served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020 (Paterson, Andrew)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Robert Davis for Summons, Complaint, and Emergency Motion for Declaratory Judgment (Paterson, Andrew)
November 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James D. Noseda on behalf of defendants Detroit Department of Elections, Janice Winfrey (Noseda, James)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #4 Emergency Motions and Dismissing State Law Claim ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #6 motion for injunctive relief ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for EMERGENCY MOTION for partial summary judgment with respect to Count IV ONLY of Complaint #4 filed by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for EMERGENCY MOTION to expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to Count IV of Complaint #1 (ECF No. 4). #5 filed by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Respect to Count I of the Complaint #1 #6 filed by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Jocelyn Benson, Detroit Department of Elections, Janice Winfrey (ems)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order or in the Alternative, Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Respect to Count I of the Complaint #1 by plaintiff Robert Davis; (Paterson, Andrew) Modified text on 10/30/2020 (ems).
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION to expedite Briefing, Scheduling and Adjudication of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to Count IV of Complaint #1 (ECF No. 4). by plaintiff Robert Davis; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Act 177 of 2020) (Paterson, Andrew) Modified text on 10/30/2020 (ems).
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION for partial summary judgment with respect to Count IV ONLY of Complaint by plaintiff Robert Davis; (Paterson, Andrew)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 EMERGENCY NOTICE re #1 to the Court Requesting the Court to Immediately Assign Case and Issue Summons by plaintiff Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew) Modified text on 10/30/2020 (ems).
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Paterson, Andrew)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Robert Davis (Paterson, Andrew)
October 14, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Robert Davis in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5805003 (Paterson, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Benson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Department of Elections
Represented By: James D. Noseda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Winfrey
Represented By: James D. Noseda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Represented By: Andrew A. Paterson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?