Skandis v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Christine Skandis
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00999
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE re #7 of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to Rule 11 Motion by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Dawn)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-12221; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
October 16, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan mailed to Christine Skandis at 312 Hoffman Street, Saugatuck, MI 49453. (BSau) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 Notice (Other) Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Remand by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Williams, Dawn) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 INDEX of Exhibits re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15) (Williams, Dawn) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Williams, Dawn) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of intent to remand by Christine Skandis (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Sanctions and Brief in Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Index of Exhibits) (Williams, Dawn) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
September 16, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order mailed to Christine Skandis at 312 Hoffman Street, Saugatuck, MI 49453. (BSau) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 COPY of #5 Order mailed to Christine Skandis and returned as undeliverable (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order mailed to Christine Skandis at 312 Holland Street, Saugatuck, MI 49453. (BSau) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, and Brief in Support filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Striking Exhibit. Response due by October 5, 2020. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, and Brief in Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: [STRICKEN] #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Williams, Dawn) Modified on 8/19/2020 (BSau). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Williams, Dawn) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Williams, Dawn) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with Exhibit A from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 2020-009105-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7994476 - Fee: $ 400 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F) (Williams, Dawn)[Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skandis v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Skandis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?