Hunt v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: William I. Hunt
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01070
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER requiring appropriate closing documents to be submitted by 2/22/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Volheim, Nathan)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020 (Volheim, Nathan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (ns)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Volheim, Nathan)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020 (Volheim, Nathan)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (ns)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
November 5, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eric Donald Coleman on behalf of plaintiff William I. Hunt (Coleman, Eric)
November 5, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of plaintiff William I. Hunt (Volheim, Nathan)
November 5, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff William I. Hunt in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5895215 (Volheim, Nathan)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Midland Credit Management, Inc. filed by William I. Hunt (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William I. Hunt
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?