Anderson v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: La Antonette Anderson
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01082
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Anton A. Dirnberger, II on behalf of defendant Speedway LLC (Dirnberger, Anton)
January 5, 2021 Copy of Restricted Access Document #9 , Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference #8 sent via U.S. Mail to La Antonette Anderson (eod)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Conference call instructions for 1/27/2021 hearing [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for La Antonette Anderson, Speedway LLC only] (jal)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/27/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; status report due by 1/22/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with certificate of service by Speedway LLC (Dirnberger, Anton) Modified text on 1/4/2021 (eod)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and certificate of service by Speedway LLC (Dirnberger, Anton) Modified text on 12/28/2020 (eod)
December 23, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Anton A. Dirnberger, II on behalf of defendant Speedway LLC (Dirnberger, Anton)
December 23, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jaclyn Rose Therese Giffen on behalf of defendant Speedway LLC (Giffen, Jaclyn)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Speedway LLC served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020 (mg)
November 17, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Speedway LLC and delivered to US Marshal for service (mg)
November 16, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to La Antonette Anderson (mg)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
November 13, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to La Antonette Anderson (mg)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Speedway LLC filed by La Antonette Anderson (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Proposed summonses) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Jaclyn Rose Therese Giffen
Represented By: Anton A. Dirnberger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Antonette Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?