Bally et al v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Carol Hatch, Steven Butler, Lena Bally and Gavriel Grossbard
Defendant: Mary Hall-Thiam, Jeannette Bradshaw, Jonathan Kinloch, Norman Shinkle, Aaron Van Langevelde, Monica Palmer, William Hartmann, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Julie Matuzak, Wayne County Board of County Canvassers, Washtenaw County Board of Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer, Allen Wilson, Dan Smith and Malcolm Doug Scott
Case Number: 1:2020cv01088
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Lena Bally, Steven Butler, Gavriel Grossbard, Carol Hatch (Goss, Maxwell)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER; Responses, if any, to the motion to intervene #10 shall be filed not later than 5:00 PM on 11/16/20; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David H. Fink on behalf of intervenor-defendant City of Detroit ; party City of Detroit added (Fink, David)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Darryl G. Bressack on behalf of intervenor-defendant City of Detroit (Bressack, Darryl)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jon Greenbaum on behalf of intervenor parties Wendell Anthony, MICHIGAN STATE CONFERENCE NAACP, Yvonne White, Andre Wilkes (Greenbaum, Jon)
November 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan Joshua Fink on behalf of intervenor-defendant City of Detroit (Fink, Nathan)
November 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE re #10 Certificate re Concurrence Efforts by intervenor Michigan State Conference, NAACP, Andre Wilkes, Yvonne White and Wendell Anthony (Driker, Eugene) Modified filers on 11/16/2020 (pjw).
November 14, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Intervene #10 filed by Michigan State Conference, NAACP, Andre Wilkes, Yvonne White and Wendell Anthony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Boockvar Complaint, #2 Exhibit Yvonne White Declaration, #3 Exhibit Andre Wilkes Declaration, #4 Exhibit Wendell Anthony Declaration) (Driker, Eugene) Modified filers on 11/16/2020 (pjw).
November 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to intervene and file responsive pleadings on the same schedule as defendants by Michigan State Confernce NAACP, Yvonne White, Wendell Anthony and Andre Wilkes (Driker, Eugene) Modified filers and text on 11/16/2020 (pjw).
November 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen E. Glazek on behalf of intervenor Wendell Anthony (Glazek, Stephen)
November 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen E. Glazek on behalf of intervenor Yvonne White (Glazek, Stephen)
November 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen E. Glazek on behalf of intervenor Andre Wilkes (Glazek, Stephen)
November 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen E. Glazek on behalf of intervenor MICHIGAN STATE CONFERENCE NAACP (Glazek, Stephen)
November 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eugene Driker on behalf of intervenor Andre Wilkes ; party Andre Wilkes added (Driker, Eugene)
November 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eugene Driker on behalf of intervenor MICHIGAN STATE CONFERENCE NAACP ; party MICHIGAN STATE CONFERENCE NAACP added (Driker, Eugene)
November 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eugene Driker on behalf of intervenor Yvonne White ; party Yvonne White added (Driker, Eugene)
November 14, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eugene Driker on behalf of intervenor Wendell Anthony ; party Wendell Anthony added (Driker, Eugene)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Rebecca Bahar-Cook, Barb Byrum, Joe Groff, Ingham County Board of Canvassers, Ted Lawson, Teena Weaver-Gordon, Jude Wells (pjw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Jeannette Bradshaw, Mary Hall-Thiam, William Hartmann, Jonathan C. Kinloch, Julie Matuzak, Michigan Board of State Canvassers, Monica Palmer, Malcolm Doug Scott, Norman D. Shinkle, Dan Smith, Aaron Van Langevelde, Washtenaw County Board of Canvassers, Wayne County Board of County Canvassers, Gretchen Whitmer, Allen Wilson (pjw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (pjw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case is related to 1:20-cv-1083 (tlbu)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to expedite #3 filed by Lena Bally, Steven Butler, Gavriel Grossbard, Carol Hatch (Goss, Maxwell)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in support of MOTION to expedite #3 - expedited consideration requested filed by Lena Bally, Steven Butler, Gavriel Grossbard, Carol Hatch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Setting Scheduling Conference, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite) (Goss, Maxwell)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to expedite by plaintiffs Lena Bally, Steven Butler, Gavriel Grossbard, Carol Hatch; (Goss, Maxwell)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Goss, Maxwell)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by Steven Butler, Lena Bally, Gavriel Grossbard, Carol Hatch (Goss, Maxwell); Modified text on 11/12/2020 (pjw).
November 11, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Lena Bally, Steven Butler, Gavriel Grossbard, Carol Hatch in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5918233 (Goss, Maxwell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bally et al v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hall-Thiam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kinloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Shinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Van Langevelde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Board of State Canvassers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Matuzak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Board of County Canvassers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washtenaw County Board of Canvassers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Doug Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hatch
Represented By: Maxwell Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Butler
Represented By: Maxwell Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Bally
Represented By: Maxwell Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavriel Grossbard
Represented By: Maxwell Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?