Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 75.48.221.50
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 75.48.221.50
Case Number: 1:2020cv01154
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to serve third-party subpoena signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb); Modified text on 12/22/2020 (pjw).
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to serve third-party subpoena by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of points and authorities, #2 Affidavit Paige Declaration, #3 Affidavit Stalzer Declaration, #4 Affidavit Williamson Declaration, #5 Proposed Order) (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 12/18/2020 (jem).
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
December 2, 2020 Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #4 , complaint #1 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
December 2, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 75.48.221.50 (proposed summons not provided) (ems)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 12/2/2020 (ems).
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 75.48.221.50 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 12/2/2020 (jlg)
December 1, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6003597 (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 75.48.221.50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel Alexander Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 75.48.221.50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?