Ward v. Consumers Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Ward
Defendant: Consumers Credit Union, DOES 1 through 5 and Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Case Number: 1:2020cv01236
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jessica Ward as to Consumers Credit Union waiver sent on 1/18/2021, answer due 3/19/2021 (McCune, Richard)
January 25, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily Jo Kirk on behalf of plaintiff Jessica Ward as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Kirk, Emily)
January 19, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael V. Krempa on behalf of defendant Consumers Credit Union (Krempa, Michael)
January 19, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Charles J. Holzman on behalf of defendant Consumers Credit Union (Holzman, Charles)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Consumers Credit Union (ns)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (McCune, Richard)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand (class action) against All Defendants filed by Jessica Ward (McCune, Richard) Modified text on 12/30/2020 (ems).
December 22, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jessica Ward in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6099036 (McCune, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Consumers Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumers Credit Union
Represented By: Charles J. Holzman
Represented By: Michael V. Krempa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Ward
Represented By: Richard Dale McCune, Jr.
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?