Lewis v. Celentino et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Lewis
Defendant: Thomas Boyd, Thomas Morgan, Darrell Slaughter, Mark Grebner, Todd Tennis, Bryan Crenshaw, Jennifer Lawton-Pace, Gretchen Whitmer, Carol Koenig, Victor Celentino, Ingham, County of, Randy Schafer, State of Michigan, Chris Trubac, Brad Delaney, Emily Stivers, James Jamo, Robin Naeyaert, Randy Maiville, Ryan Sebolt, Scott Macomber and Mark Polsdofer
Case Number: 1:2020cv01261
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Thomas Boyd, Victor Celentino, Bryan Crenshaw, Brad Delaney, Mark Grebner, Ingham, County of, James Jamo, Carol Koenig, Jennifer Lawton-Pace, Scott Macomber, Randy Maiville, Thomas Morgan, Robin Naeyaert, Mark Polsdofer, Randy Schafer, Ryan Sebolt, Darrell Slaughter, Emily Stivers, Todd Tennis, Chris Trubac re Brief in Support of a Motion, #9 , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #8 (Toskey, Bonnie) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (eod)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #8 with certificate of compliance filed by Thomas Boyd, Victor Celentino, Bryan Crenshaw, Brad Delaney, Mark Grebner, Ingham, County of, James Jamo, Carol Koenig, Jennifer Lawton-Pace, Scott Macomber, Randy Maiville, Thomas Morgan, Robin Naeyaert, Mark Polsdofer, Randy Schafer, Ryan Sebolt, Darrell Slaughter, Emily Stivers, Todd Tennis, Chris Trubac (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 55th District Ct ROA, No 1900922, #2 Exhibit 2 - 55th District Ct ROA, No 19I527238, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2-25-2020 Judgment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Preliminary Exam Transcripts, #5 Exhibit 5 - 30th Circuit Ct ROA, No 20-191-FH) (Toskey, Bonnie) Modified text on 2/16/2021 (eod)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Thomas Boyd, Victor Celentino, Bryan Crenshaw, Brad Delaney, Mark Grebner, Ingham, County of, James Jamo, Carol Koenig, Jennifer Lawton-Pace, Scott Macomber, Randy Maiville, Thomas Morgan, Robin Naeyaert, Mark Polsdofer, Randy Schafer, Ryan Sebolt, Darrell Slaughter, Emily Stivers, Todd Tennis, Chris Trubac; (Toskey, Bonnie)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Thomas Boyd, Victor Celentino, Bryan Crenshaw, Brad Delaney, Mark Grebner, Ingham, County of, James Jamo, Carol Koenig, Jennifer Lawton-Pace, Scott Macomber, Randy Maiville, Thomas Morgan, Robin Naeyaert, Mark Polsdofer, Randy Schafer, Ryan Sebolt, Darrell Slaughter, Emily Stivers, Todd Tennis, Chris Trubac re Attorney Appearance (Toskey, Bonnie) Modified text on 2/10/2021 (eod)
February 8, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy M. Perrone on behalf of defendants Thomas Boyd, Victor Celentino, Bryan Crenshaw, Brad Delaney, Mark Grebner, Ingham, County of, James Jamo, Carol Koenig, Jennifer Lawton-Pace, Scott Macomber, Randy Maiville, Thomas Morgan, Robin Naeyaert, Mark Polsdofer, Randy Schafer, Ryan Sebolt, Darrell Slaughter, Emily Stivers, Todd Tennis, Chris Trubac (Perrone, Timothy)
February 8, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bonnie G. Toskey on behalf of defendants Thomas Boyd, Victor Celentino, Bryan Crenshaw, Brad Delaney, Mark Grebner, Ingham, County of, James Jamo, Carol Koenig, Jennifer Lawton-Pace, Scott Macomber, Randy Maiville, Thomas Morgan, Robin Naeyaert, Mark Polsdofer, Randy Schafer, Ryan Sebolt, Darrell Slaughter, Emily Stivers, Todd Tennis, Chris Trubac (Toskey, Bonnie)
January 15, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Thomas Boyd, Victor Celentino, Bryan Crenshaw, Brad Delaney, Mark Grebner, Ingham, County of, James Jamo, Carol Koenig, Jennifer Lawton-Pace, Scott Macomber, Randy Maiville, State of Michigan, Thomas Morgan, Robin Naeyaert, Mark Polsdofer, Randy Schafer, Ryan Sebolt, Darrell Slaughter, Emily Stivers, Todd Tennis, Chris Trubac, Gretchen Whitmer (eod)
January 15, 2021 Copy of Order #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Joseph Lewis (eod)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER denying #3 motion for service of summons; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
January 15, 2021 Copy of Order on Motion to Serve the Complaint #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Joseph Lewis (eod)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 motion to serve the complaint; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (eod)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to serve the complaint (in letter form) by plaintiff Joseph Lewis; (eod)
January 5, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Joseph Lewis (eod)
January 5, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to plaintiff Joseph Lewis (none provided) (eod)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (eod)
January 4, 2021 RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number LN002787; for civil filing fee (eod) Modified date filed on 1/5/2021 (eod)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joseph Lewis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Celentino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Boyd
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Morgan
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Slaughter
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Grebner
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Tennis
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Crenshaw
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lawton-Pace
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Koenig
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Celentino
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingham, County of
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Schafer
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Trubac
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Delaney
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Stivers
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jamo
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Naeyaert
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Maiville
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Sebolt
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Macomber
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Polsdofer
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Timothy M. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?