Sherman v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Sherman
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2021cv00063
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Serving Initial Disclosures Upon Defendant by plaintiff Lisa Sherman (Schwartz, Mark)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Notice #14 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Mona K. Majzoub returned to the Court marked return to sender; undeliverable as addressed ; notified ADR Administrator (pjw)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Speedway LLC for Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Johnston, Amy)
March 8, 2021 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 5385 as to plaintiff Lisa Sherman (lep)
March 5, 2021 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 472164 as to defendant Speedway LLC (lep)
March 3, 2021 Copy of Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Mona K. Majzoub (jmw)
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Mona K. Majzoub ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 3/9/2021 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 3/9/2021 (lep)
February 26, 2021 Filing 13 SELECTION of Mona Majzoub as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Lisa Sherman (Schwartz, Mark)
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE cancelling 2/22/2021 Rule 16 scheduling conference (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Schwartz, Mark)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED EXHIBIT A re Notice of Removal #1 by defendant Speedway LLC (Johnston, Amy) Modified text on 2/2/2021 (pjw).
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Lisa Sherman (Schwartz, Mark)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 2/22/2021 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 2/16/2021; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 27, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen Michael Ragatzki on behalf of defendant Speedway LLC (Ragatzki, Stephen)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Speedway LLC (Johnston, Amy)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Speedway LLC re Notice of Removal, #1 , Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #4 with the Kalamazoo County Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment Confirmation and Acceptance of Filing) (Johnston, Amy) Modified text on 1/22/2021 (pjw).
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re notice of filing notice of removal (pjw)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Speedway LLC (Johnston, Amy)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Speedway LLC re Notice of Removal, #1 (Johnston, Amy)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kalmazoo County Circuit Court case number 2020-0400-NO filed by Speedway LLC (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Westlaw Records Search, #4 Exhibit C - Corporate Statements, #5 Exhibit D - Verdicts) (Johnston, Amy)
January 20, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Speedway LLC in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6220176 (Johnston, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherman v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Amy M. Johnston
Represented By: Stephen Michael Ragatzki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sherman
Represented By: Mark Kelley Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: Mona K. Majzoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?