Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kymberlee S. Rogers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00075
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021 (ns)
January 25, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (ns)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (ns)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Olinsky, Howard)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Kymberlee S. Rogers; (Olinsky, Howard)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Kymberlee S. Rogers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kymberlee S. Rogers
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?