Ash-Shakoor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Aqeel T. Ash-Shakoor
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00098
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 22 INITIAL BRIEF by plaintiff Aqeel T. Ash-Shakoor with certificate of compliance (Phillips, Randall) Modified text on 3/5/2021 (ndj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 JOINT STATEMENT consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (Shiparski, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE to the parties regarding consent and filing of briefs according to the following schedule: joint statement regarding consent due 2/18/2021, plaintiff's initial brief due 3/4/2021; defendant's brief due 4/1/2021; plaintiff's reply brief due 4/15/2021 (fhw)
February 3, 2021 Filing 19 ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS TRANSCRIPT ECF No. 18 and In lieu of separate Answer - W.D. Mich. LCivR 8.3 by defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Administrative Process Documents, #3 Administrative Process Documents, #4 Administrative Process Documents, #5 Payment Documents and Decisions - Exhibits 1A-4A, #6 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices - Exhibits 1B-8B, #7 Non Disability Related Development - Exhibits 1D-10D, #8 Disability Related Development - Exhibits 1E-4E, #9 Disability Related Development - Exhibits 5E-28E, #10 Disability Related Development - Exhibits 29E, #11 Medical Records - Exhibits 1F-2F, #12 Medical Records - Exhibits 3F, #13 Medical Records - Exhibits 3F, #14 Medical Records - Exhibits 3F, #15 Medical Records - Exhibits 3F, #16 Medical Records - Exhibits 4F-7F, #17 Medical Records - Exhibits 8F, #18 Medical Records - Exhibits 8F-12F, #19 Medical Records - Exhibits 13F-14F, #20 Medical Records - Exhibits 15F-22F, #21 Medical Records - Exhibits 23F, #22 Medical Records - Exhibits 23F, #23 Medical Records - Exhibits 23F-24F) (Shiparski, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 motion for extension of time to file administrative transcript; administrative transcript shall be filed by 2/5/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
February 1, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of receipt of case (ndj)
January 29, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file the certified administrative record in lieu of an answer to plaintiff's complaint #15 filed by Commissioner of Social Security (Preston, Sarah)
January 29, 2021 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file the certified administrative record in lieu of an answer to plaintiff's complaint by defendant Commissioner of Social Security; (Preston, Sarah)
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-12184; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ems)
January 29, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael L. Shiparski on behalf of defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Shiparski, Michael)
January 29, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sarah E. Preston on behalf of defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Preston, Sarah)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of Michigan by Aqeel T. Ash-Shakoor. (Phillips, Randall) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis) (Santen, Sean) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Commissioner of Social Security answer due 1/29/2021. Issued by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (MacKay, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Commissioner of Social Security answer due 1/15/2021. Issued by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (MacKay, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis) (Santen, Sean) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris to Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr pursuant to Administrative Order 20-AO-049. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 09/22/2020. (Phillips, Randall) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Santen on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Santen, Sean) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Phillips, Randall) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Social Security Administration served on 09/18/2020. (Phillips, Randall) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Aqeel T. Ash-Shakoor. (Phillips, Randall) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW filed by Aqeel T. Ash-Shakoor against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ingham - County Where Action Arose: Ingham - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Phillips, Randall) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]
August 13, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 1/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ash-Shakoor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael L. Shiparski
Represented By: Sarah E. Preston
Represented By: Sean Dalton Santen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aqeel T. Ash-Shakoor
Represented By: Randall E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?