Adhezion, Inc. v. Wilson
Plaintiff: Adhezion, Inc.
Defendant: Melanie Gordon Wilson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00138
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving #10 stipulation to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing #7 order to show cause; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to attorney William L. Henn regarding recent filing #10 (ems)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATED MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Adhezion, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henn, William)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for plaintiff to respond to order to show cause #7 is extended to 3/19/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATED MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to deadline to show case by plaintiff Adhezion, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henn, William)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 3/8/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT FILE register of actions received from Kent County Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Documents) (ndj) Modified text on 2/18/2021 (ndj)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction with Brief in Support by defendant Melanie Gordon Wilson; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Unpublished Case) (Hurwitz, Noah)
February 15, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE by defendant Melanie Gordon Wilson to Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Amended Notice of Removal) (Hurwitz, Noah)
February 15, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Melanie Gordon Wilson in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6302035 (Hurwitz, Noah)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant Wilson to show cause by 3/12/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ndj)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Circuit Court case number 20-09598-CBB filed by Melanie Gordon Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Register of Actions) (Hurwitz, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adhezion, Inc. v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Gordon Wilson
Represented By: Noah Sklar Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adhezion, Inc.
Represented By: William L. Henn
Represented By: Andrew Anthony Cascini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?