Soto Villafuerte et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Jose Guadalupe Soto Villafuerte and Jordin Taylor Soto
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security and United States Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 1:2021cv00196
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiffs Jordin Taylor Soto, Jose Guadalupe Soto Villafuerte (Asch, Marc)
March 15, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant United States Customs and Border Protection (proposed summons not submitted by filing party) (ems)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Jordin Taylor Soto, Jose Guadalupe Soto Villafuerte re Amended Complaint #6 (Asch, Marc)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jose Guadalupe Soto Villafuerte, Jordin Taylor Soto (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 3/15/2021 (ems).
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed on All Defendants, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Affidavit declaration re service) (Asch, Marc)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (eod)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Asch, Marc)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jose Guadalupe Soto Villafuerte, Jordin Taylor Soto (Asch, Marc)
February 26, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Jordin Taylor Soto, Jose Guadalupe Soto Villafuerte in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6345914 (Asch, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto Villafuerte et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Guadalupe Soto Villafuerte
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordin Taylor Soto
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?