Jessup v. Olson, et al
Plaintiff: Al Jessup
Defendant: Nathan Olson, Ingham, County of, Unknown Parties, William Eberhardt, Ray Durham, Peter Smith, Unknown Party and Les Rochefort
Case Number: 1:2021cv00232
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Al Jessup as to Ray Durham waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021; William Eberhardt waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021; Ingham, County of waiver sent on 4/6/2021, answer due 6/7/2021; Nathan Olson waiver sent on 4/6/2021, answer due 6/7/2021; Les Rochefort waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021; Peter Smith waiver sent on 4/8/2021, answer due 6/7/2021 (Coontz, Dustyn)
April 13, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mary Allison Waddell on behalf of defendants Ray Durham, William Eberhardt, Les Rochefort, Peter Smith (Waddell, Mary)
April 9, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sarah Kay Osburn on behalf of defendants Ingham, County of, Nathan Olson (Osburn, Sarah)
April 9, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bonnie G. Toskey on behalf of defendants Ingham, County of, Nathan Olson (Toskey, Bonnie)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (eod)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Al Jessup (Coontz, Dustyn)
March 11, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to plaintiff Al Jessup (none provided) (eod)
March 11, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Al Jessup in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6378543 (Coontz, Dustyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jessup v. Olson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Jessup
Represented By: Dustyn K. Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Olson
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Sarah Kay Osburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingham, County of
Represented By: Bonnie G. Toskey
Represented By: Sarah Kay Osburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Eberhardt
Represented By: Mary Allison Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Durham
Represented By: Mary Allison Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Smith
Represented By: Mary Allison Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Rochefort
Represented By: Mary Allison Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?