Harris v. United States of America
Petitioner: Dominique Javon Harris
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00347
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) #1 and certificate of service filed by United States of America (Roth, Jonathan)
May 25, 2021 Copy of Order Regarding Response to Motion #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Dominique Javon Harris (mlc)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding response to Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) #1 ; Government to file on or before 6/23/2021;signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (jas)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (slk)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 (DISREGARD) NOTICE of receipt of case (slk) Modified text on 4/28/2021 - document did not attach, please see #3 (slk).
April 28, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Dominique Javon Harris (slk)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) filed by Dominique Javon Harris (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Smith Murnahan
Represented By: Jonathan Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dominique Javon Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?