Jean v. Johns
Petitioner: Richekad Jean
Respondent: Tracy Johns
Case Number: 1:2021cv00431
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER serving habeas petition into three actions; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
May 24, 2021 Copy of Order #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Richekad Jean #15776-104 (eod)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from petitioner Richekad Jean regarding status of case; mailed copy of docket sheet on 05/24/2021 (eod)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
April 27, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Richekad Jean #15776-104 (eod)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (eod)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Georgia Southern, their case number 5:21-cv-00031; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ems)
April 23, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Richekad Jean #15776-104 (eod)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richekad Jean. The Court Orders this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan, Southern Division. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan, Southern Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 4/22/2021. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 4/23/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richekad Jean. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2021: #2 Exhibit 1 - Inmate Trust Account Statement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Use of Force Remedies, #4 Exhibit 3 - Food Poisoning Remedies) (maa). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 4/23/2021.]
April 19, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 4/23/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form)(pts) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 4/23/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Richekad Jean. (Attachments: #1 Briefs)(pts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2021: #2 Brief, #3 Exhibits and Envelope) (slt). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 4/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jean v. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richekad Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tracy Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?