Murphy v. Lasata et al
Plaintiff: Hurtis L. Murphy
Defendant: Corey Burks, Paul Bailey, Charles T. Lasata, Gretchen Whitmer, Marcus Muhammad and Unknown Party
Case Number: 1:2021cv00454
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #10 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Hurtis L Murphy (tlbu)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REJECTING letter regarding jail time with attachment submitted by Hurtis L. Murphy; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (jln)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff indicating he "did 185 days over" (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #7 and Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Hurtis L. Murphy (jem)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff Hurtis L. Murphy regarding status of case; docket sheet mailed 6/21/2021 (jem)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $402.00, receipt number KZ004300; amount paid to date $402.00 (ems)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from Hurtis L. Murphy regarding case information (jem)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from plaintiff Hurtis L. Murphy regarding case information (pjw)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER from plaintiff Hurtis L. Murphy regarding case information and filing fee (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (jem)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (jem)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Hurtis L. Murphy (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F) (jem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Lasata et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles T. Lasata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hurtis L. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?