Johnson #937143 v. Parish
Petitioner: Aquarius Johnson #937143
Respondent: Les Parish
Case Number: 1:2021cv00456
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: this order, petition and brief served electronically on Michigan Department of Corrections and Attorney General of the State of MI; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 180 days; no extensions will be granted; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment) (fhw)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas) #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Aquarius Johnson #937143 (ems)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from petitioner Aquarius Johnson #937143 regarding payment of filing fee (ems)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.51, receipt number KZ004316 (ems)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Aquarius Johnson #937143 (ems)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER from petitioner Aquarius Johnson #937143 regarding filing fee and requesting docket sheet; Response from Clerk and docket sheet mailed to petitioner 6/21/21 (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk) (ems)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #6 and amended 2254 form sent via U.S. Mail to Aquarius Johnson #937143 (ems)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Deficiency Order #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Aquarius Johnson #937143 (ems)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 7/2/2021 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:21-cv-10938; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ems)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Aquarius Johnson #937143 (ems)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/4/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Aquarius Johnson against Les Parish. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 6/4/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson #937143 v. Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aquarius Johnson #937143
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Les Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?