Guy #251862 v. Rewerts
Petitioner: Ashanti R. Guy #251862
Respondent: Randee Rewerts
Case Number: 1:2021cv00485
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number GR074404 (jem)
June 23, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrea M. Christensen-Brown on behalf of respondent Randee Rewerts (Christensen-Brown, Andrea)
June 17, 2021 Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas), #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Ashanti R. Guy #251862 (jmw)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: this order, petition and brief served electronically on Michigan Department of Corrections and Attorney General of the State of MI; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 180 days; no extensions will be granted; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (jkw)
June 15, 2021 Copy of Deficiency Order, #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Ashanti R. Guy #251862 (ns)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 7/12/2021 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 7/12/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Ashanti R. Guy #251862 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-B) (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy #251862 v. Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randee Rewerts
Represented By: Andrea M. Christensen-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ashanti R. Guy #251862
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?