Holbrook #767925 v. Carl
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Charles Judson Holbrook #767925
Respondent: Becky Carl
Case Number: 1:2021cv00494
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 USCA CASE NUMBER 21-2634 assigned to second/successive #1 (mkc)
June 17, 2021 Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to CCA (Habeas) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (jmw)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS CASE to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as second/successive; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (jem)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Ohio Southern, their case number 1:21-cv-00356; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ems)
June 11, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (jem)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan for all further proceedings. Furthermore, in light of petitioner's filing history in this Court, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED not to accept for filing any additional documents submitted by petitioner in this case. Should petitioner wish to file additional documents in this action, he must do so in the Western District of Michigan. Petitioner is again advised that if he continues to file collateral challenges to his Michigan conviction and sentence in this Court which is not the proper venue he may be declared a vexatious litigator and subject to sanctions and/or filing restrictions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/10/2021. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 6/11/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Case transferred to the Western District of Michigan. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (km) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 6/11/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Compassionate Relief by Petitioner Charles Holbrook, r. (bjc). Modified To Remove Blank Pages on 6/1/2021 (bjc). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 6/11/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Compassionate Relief by Petitioner Charles Holbrook, r. (bjc) . Modified To Remove Blank Pages on 6/1/2021 (bjc). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 6/11/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holbrook #767925 v. Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Becky Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Charles Judson Holbrook #767925
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?