Hodges v. Abram et al
Plaintiff: Kim Hodges
Defendant: Sergeant Joseph Abram, John Doe Deputies, County of Kent, Joseph Abram, Unknown Part(y)(ies) and Kent, County of
Case Number: 1:2021cv00500
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 for extension of time to Answer for Defendants Kent County and Sgt. Joseph Abram is extended to August 30, 2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer by defendants Joseph Abram, Kent, County of (Konwinski, Kyle)
July 19, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kyle Patrick Konwinski on behalf of defendants Joseph Abram, Kent, County of (Konwinski, Kyle)
July 19, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Chloe Cunningham on behalf of defendants Joseph Abram, Kent, County of (Cunningham, Chloe)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Joseph Abram served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021; Kent, County of served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Radner, Solomon)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Joseph Abram, Kent, County of (ns)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ns)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Radner, Solomon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Joseph Abram, County of Kent, John Doe Deputies filed by Kim Hodges (Radner, Solomon)
June 14, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kim Hodges in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6462035 (Radner, Solomon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. Abram et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Joseph Abram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Abram
Represented By: Chloe Cunningham
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent, County of
Represented By: Chloe Cunningham
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Konwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Hodges
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?