Mission Cycles LLC et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Mission Cycles LLC and Patrick Karpowski
Defendant: Chase Merchant Services and JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00512
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Certified Copy of Order on Motion to Dismiss #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Patrick Karpowski and Mission Cycles LLC (eod) Modified text on 6/25/2021 (eod)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion to dismiss; this action is dismissed without prejudice; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss without prejudice by plaintiffs Patrick Karpowski, Mission Cycles LLC; (eod)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Chase Merchant Services, JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. and mailed to Mission Cycles LLC and Patrick Karpowski (eod) Modified text on 6/22/2021 (eod)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (eod)
June 22, 2021 Copy of Order #5 , Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Order #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Patrick Karpowski and Mission Cycles LLC (eod)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Plaintiff Mission Cycles, LLC to file an appearance of counsel within 21 days or Mission Cycles, LLC may be dismissed as a plaintiff; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice PRO SE APPLICATION #2 ; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that plaintiff Mission Cycles LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (eod)
June 18, 2021 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Patrick Karpowski (eod)
June 18, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED (none provided) (eod)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically by plaintiff Patrick Karpowski; (eod)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chase Merchant Services, JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. filed by Patrick Karpowski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (eod)
June 17, 2021 RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number GR074323; for civil filing fee (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mission Cycles LLC et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Merchant Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mission Cycles LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Karpowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?