Johnson #235820 v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: William Johnson #235820
Defendant: Unknown Minor, Margaret Quellete, J. Traeore, Unknown Donning, Linda Thompson, Robert Ault, Timothy Shaw, Unknown Blue, Brian Morrison, Unknown Doffing, Gretchen Whitmer and Heidi Washington
Case Number: 1:2021cv00532
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form, #36 sent via U.S. Mail to all Plaintiffs with their respective docket sheet and amended 1983 form (slk)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER directing each plaintiff to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; plaintiffs' request for class certification is DENIED; plaintiffs' motion to amend #6 is DENIED; plaintiffs Hale, Anderson, Jackson, Holloway, Crawford, Dulin, Johnson, Gaskins, Merriweather, Stevens, and Mackiehowell are GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff Hart has 28 days to pay the civil action fees, which total $402.00; claims of each of the remaining plaintiffs shall be severed from the other plaintiffs; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 22, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #35 sent via U.S. Mail to all plaintiffs (mlc)
June 22, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #35 with rejected documents sent via U.S. Mail to Randy N. Richardson (mlc)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Join submitted by Randy N. Richardson; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
June 17, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #34 sent via U.S. Mail to Terrence Terrell Moore #208380, James A. Hale #182038, Mark Anderson #325850, DreMaris Jackson #709776, Spencer Holloway #186399, Lewis Hart #230290, Kenneth Crawford #143333, William Merriweather #131483, Darryl Dulin #197483, William Johnson #235820, William Johnson #235820, Jeffrey Gaskins #647296, and Felton Mackiehowell #647407 (jmw)
June 16, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #34 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Demiestro Watson #229858 (jmw)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Join submitted by Demiestro Watson #229858; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
June 14, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #33 with rejected documents sent via U.S. Mail to Perry V. Bradley (mlc)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Join submitted by Perry V. Bradley; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
June 10, 2021 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral,, #1 named as, "Obstruction of Justice / Obstruction to Administration of Justice / Obstruction of Court Order" by plaintiff DreMaris Jackson #709776 (Attachments: #1 Letter) (mlc)
June 7, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE re #1 named as, "Formal Complaint to State Prosecuting Office for the County of Branch" filed by Terrence Terrell Moore #208380 (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments, #2 Miscellaeous Attachments) (mlc)
June 3, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #30 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Shaquale Jackson #814100 (tlbu)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Join submitted by Shaquale Jackson #814100; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
May 25, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #29 , with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Christopher Lawrence #970911, Order Rejecting Pleading #28 , with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to DiJon Malek Lee-Smith #854007 (tlbu)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Join submitted by Christoper R. Lawrence; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Join submitted by DiJon Malike-Lee Smith; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
May 19, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #27 with rejected documents sent via U.S. Mail to Walter Neal #377117 (mlc)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Join submitted by Walter Neal #377117; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
May 13, 2021 Filing 25 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner #3 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Mark Anderson returned to the Court marked name and inmate number do not match; corrected inmate number and remailed to Lakeland Correctional Facility (pjw); Modified file date on 5/14/2021 (pjw).
May 13, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #22 sent via U.S. Mail to all plaintiffs, and to John Barrera #160094 (with copy of documents) (ndj) Modified text on 5/13/2021 (ndj)
May 12, 2021 Filing 26 LETTER from plaintiff Terrence Terrell Moore #208380 requesting docket sheet; mailed copy of docket sheet on 05/14/2021 (eod)
May 12, 2021 Filing 24 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees submitted by plaintiff William Merriweather #131483 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (eod)
May 12, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #23 and original proposed document sent via U.S. Mail to Robert Battle #141586 at Lakeland Correctional Facility (mg)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REJECTING Motion to join submitted by Robert Battle; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Join submitted by John Barrera #160094; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
May 6, 2021 Filing 21 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff William Merriweather #131483 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
May 6, 2021 Filing 20 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff William Johnson #235820 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents, #2 Affidavit) (mlc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 19 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff Kenneth Crawford #143333 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 18 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff DreMaris Jackson #709776 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 17 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff Felton Mackiehowell #647407 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 16 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff Jeffrey Gaskins #647296 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Mark Anderson #329890 re Supplement,, #14 , Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency), #10 , Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency), #11 , Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency), #12 , Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency), #13 (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to amend/correct #1 (titled Motion to amend and supplement pleadings) #6 by plaintiffs Mark Anderson #329890, Kenneth Crawford #143333, Darryl Dulin #197483, Jeffrey Gaskins #647296, James A. Hale #182038, Lewis Hart #230290, Spencer Holloway #186399, DreMaris Jackson #709776, William Johnson #235820, Felton Mackiehowell #647407, William Merriweather #131483, Terrence Terrell Moore #208380, Randy Stevens #214912 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint on Class Members with Signatures, #2 Exhibit B - Declarations of Class Members, #3 Exhibit C - Case Law Authority) (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff Randy Stevens #214912 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff Lewis Hart #230290 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff Darryl Dulin #197483 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff Mark Anderson #329890 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff Spencer Holloway #186399 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): authorization for withdrawal of funds with the certificate of prisoner institutional trust fund account activity submitted by plaintiff Spencer Holloway #186399 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity submitted by plaintiff James A. Hale #182038 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Document) (slk)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to amend/correct #1 (titled Motion to amend and supplement pleadings) by plaintiffs Mark Anderson #329890, Kenneth Crawford #143333, Darryl Dulin #197483, Jeffrey Gaskins #647296, James A. Hale #182038, Lewis Hart #230290, Spencer Holloway #186399, DreMaris Jackson #709776, William Johnson #235820, Felton Mackiehowell #647407, William Merriweather #131483, Terrence Terrell Moore #208380, Randy Stevens #214912; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E) (pjw)
April 16, 2021 Copy of Order, #5 sent via e-mail to Michigan Department of Corrections (slk)
April 16, 2021 Copy of Order, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to all Plaintiffs (slk)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER VACATING #3 ; GRANTING IFP #4 when funds in the amount of $26.92 become available to Terrence Moore; remaining Plaintiffs shall each, within 28 days, submit their $30.92 portion of the filing fee or, alternatively file an application to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
February 12, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to James A. Hale #182038, DreMaris Jackson #709776, Spencer Holloway #186399, Lewis Hart #230290, Kenneth Crawford #143333, William Merriweather #131483, Mark Anderson #329890, Darryl Dulin #197483, William Johnson #235820, Randy Stevens #214912, Jeffrey Gaskins #647296, Felton Mackiehowell #647407 (ndj)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Darryl Dulin #197483; (Attachments: #1 Class Statement, #2 Exhibit A Complaint of Class Members, #3 Exhibit B Declaration of Class Member Darryl Dulin, #4 Exhibit C Class Members Case Law Authority) (ndj)
February 8, 2021 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Terrence Terrell Moore #208380 (ndj)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (VACATED) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) Modified text on 4/16/2021 - vacated per order #5 (slk).
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Terrence Terrell Moore #208380; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ndj)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Terrence Terrell Moore #208380, James A. Hale #182038, DreMaris Jackson #709776, Spencer Holloway #186399, Lewis Hart #230290, Kenneth Crawford #143333, William Merriweather #131483, Mark Anderson #329890, Darryl Dulin #197483, William Johnson #235820, Randy Stevens #214912, Jeffrey Gaskins #647296, Felton Mackiehowell #647407 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint of Class Members, #2 Exhibit B Declarations of Class Members, #3 Exhibit C Class Members Case Law Authority (ndj) Modified text on 2/11/2021 (ndj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson #235820 v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Johnson #235820
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Quellete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Traeore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Donning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Doffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?