Meyers v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: David L. Meyers
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC and William Cook Europe, APS
Case Number: 1:2021cv00586
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Southern District of Indiana, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 1:21-cv-06533 (ems)
August 2, 2021 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Southern District of Indiana per CTO re MDL No. 2570 (ems)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Southern District of Indiana; case transferred to Southern District of Indiana under MDL No. 2570, In Re: Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation (ems)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Southern District of Indiana regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2570, IN RE: Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation (jem)
July 30, 2021 Remark: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-154) Finalized on 7/30/21. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. Indiana for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/30/2021. (jem)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe, APS (ems)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ems)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by David L. Meyers (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Oliver, Alyson) Modified text on 7/12/2021 (ems).
July 12, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff David L. Meyers in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6485086 (Oliver, Alyson)
July 12, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe, APS (filing fee not paid) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Meyers
Represented By: Alyson L. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe, APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?