Smith #790460 v. Artis
Petitioner: Kevin Smith #790460
Respondent: Fredeane Artis
Case Number: 1:2021cv00588
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: failure to file an amended petition on the approved form as ordered by the Court ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 1, 2021 Certified Copy of Judgment Dismissing Case #7 , Order Dismissing Case (no motion) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Smith (slk)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for all further proceedings (slk)
August 26, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Smith (slk)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; Petitioner's motion for extension re #1 is DENIED without prejudice; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
July 27, 2021 Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #4 and amended 2254 habeas petition form sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Smith #790460 (ems)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/10/2021 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 8/10/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to petitioner regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 8/3/2021 (ems)
July 13, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Smith #790460 (ems)
July 13, 2021 Copy of Deficiency Order, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Smith #790460 (ems)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus (titled as 'Motion for 120 Day Extension on Federal Habeas') filed by Kevin Smith #790460 (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith #790460 v. Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Smith #790460
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fredeane Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?