Holbrook #767925 v. Carl
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Charles Judson Holbrook #767925
Respondent: Becky Carl
Case Number: 1:2021cv00591
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 with original documents (eod) Modified text on 8/5/2021 (eod)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REJECTING Reminder to the court submitted by Charles Holbrook #767925; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
July 21, 2021 USCA CASE NUMBER 21-2734 assigned to second/successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 filed by Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (mkc)
July 19, 2021 Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to CCA (Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (eod)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS CASE to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as second/successive; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 8/3/2021 (eod)
July 13, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (eod)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Charles Judson Holbrook #767925 (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holbrook #767925 v. Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Charles Judson Holbrook #767925
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Becky Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?