Dupree #532834 v. Skipper
Petitioner: Dwayne Anthony Dupree #532834
Respondent: Gregory Skipper
Case Number: 1:2021cv00611
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for all further proceedings (eod)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (DISREGARD) NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for all further proceedings (eod) Modified text on 8/4/2021; incomplete notice (eod)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Dwayne Anthony Dupree #532834 (jmw)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by petitioner Dwayne Anthony Dupree #532834 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (eod)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 8/16/2021 (eod)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Dwayne Anthony Dupree #532834 (eod)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Dwayne Anthony Dupree #532834 re Receipt (Habeas), Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 , Brief (Related Document) #2 (eod)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 BRIEF by petitioner Dwayne Anthony Dupree #532834 re #1 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (eod)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Dwayne Anthony Dupree #532834 with signature taken from #2 (eod) Modified text on 7/21/2021 (eod)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number GR074589 (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupree #532834 v. Skipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dwayne Anthony Dupree #532834
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Skipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?