Talton v. Grand Rapids Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Jaeloni Talton
Defendant: Grand Rapids Police Department, David Kadzban, Brandon Romero, Eric Gizzi and Lucas Nagtzaam
Case Number: 1:2021cv00633
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Jaeloni Talton consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (pjw)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/24/2021 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 8/17/2021 (pjw)
July 27, 2021 Copy of Deficiency Order #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Jaeloni Talton (pjw)
July 27, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Jaeloni Talton (pjw)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jaeloni Talton (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talton v. Grand Rapids Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaeloni Talton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Rapids Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kadzban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Gizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Nagtzaam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?