United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Rupp
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Joshua Louis Rupp
Case Number: 1:2021cv00643
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Copy of Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Joshua Louis Rupp #791699 (pjw)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 10/19/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
September 7, 2021 Copy of Order on Motion for Discovery #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Joshua Louis Rupp #791699 (mg)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Defendant's Motion Under Rule 26, General Provisions Governing Discovery; Clerk shall docket Defendant's motion #5 as answer to complaint; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for discovery named as, "motion under rule 26 general provisions governing discovery" #5 with certificate of service filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Bentsen, Derek) Modified text on 9/3/2021 (pjw).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for discovery named as, "motion under rule 26 general provisions governing discovery" #5 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint by defendant Joshua Louis Rupp; (mlc) Modified text on 9/7/2021 per #7 (mg).
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Joshua Louis Rupp served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021 (Bentsen, Derek)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Joshua Louis Rupp (pjw)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (pjw)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Joshua Louis Rupp filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Bentsen, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Derek Bentsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Louis Rupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?