Siegers Seed Company v. Utopia Packing, LLC
Plaintiff: Siegers Seed Company and Siegers Holding Company
Defendant: Utopia Packing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00657
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: plaintiff to either apply for entry of default or to show cause by 10/5/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to attorney Gregory J. McCoy regarding recent filing #5 (slk)
August 4, 2021 SUMMONS returned executed; Utopia Packing, LLC served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021 (slk) Modified text on 8/5/2021 filed regarding wrong event used for #5 (slk).
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Utopia Packing, LLC filed by Siegers Seed Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (McCoy, Gregory)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Siegers Seed Company re Summons Issued #3 , complaint #1 (McCoy, Gregory)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Siegers Seed Company (McCoy, Gregory)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Utopia Packing, LLC (mg)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Utopia Packing, LLC filed by Siegers Seed Company (McCoy, Gregory)
August 2, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Siegers Seed Company in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6503049 (McCoy, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siegers Seed Company v. Utopia Packing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siegers Seed Company
Represented By: Gregory J. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siegers Holding Company
Represented By: Gregory J. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utopia Packing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?