Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 98.250.11.164
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 98.250.11.164
Case Number: 1:2021cv00696
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion for leave to serve third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to serve a third-party subpoena by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authority in Support, #2 Williamson Declaration, #3 Paige Declaration, #4 Stalzer Declaration, #5 Proposed Order) (Bernier, Joel) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (eod)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (mlc)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mlc)
August 13, 2021 Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #4 , complaint #1 with exhibits sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (mlc)
August 13, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 98.250.11.164 (Summons Not Provided) (mlc)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 98.250.11.164 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)
August 12, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6513052 (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 98.250.11.164
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel Alexander Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 98.250.11.164
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?