Harris #370250 v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Edaveon Montrell Harris #370250
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections and Unknown Miller
Case Number: 1:2021cv00805
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #9 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Edaveon Montrell Harris #370250 (ns)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Edaveon Montrell Harris #370250 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ns)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $58.21 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/8/2021 (ns)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:21-cv-12104; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ns)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Edaveon Montrell Harris #370250 (ns)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Edaveon Montrell Harris #370250 (ns)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Edaveon Harris (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Edaveon Harris. (TTho) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Edaveon Harris against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris #370250 v. Michigan Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edaveon Montrell Harris #370250
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?