Preston #235170 v. Burgess et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Preston #235170
Defendant: M. Burgess, J. Clouse, J. Spencley, B. Majerczyk and R. McCory
Case Number: 1:2021cv00830
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: for lack of prosecution; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Certified Copy of Judgment Dismissing Case #12 , Order Dismissing Case (no motion) #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Harvey Preston #235170 (ns)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #10 , Opinion #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Harvey Preston #235170 (ns)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $402.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Harvey Preston #235170 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ns)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #6 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Harvey Preston #235170 returned to the Court marked not deliverable as addressed unable to forward; re-sent to plaintiff at Oaks CF on 9/29/2021 (mlc) Modified text on 10/5/2021 (mlc).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #6 re-sent via U.S. Mail to Harvey Preston #235170 to his corrected address. (ns)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/18/2021 (ns)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 4:21-cv-12197; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ns)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Harvey Preston #235170 (ns)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/27/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/27/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (as taken from #2 ) (ns)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Authorization for Withdrawal of funds to pay the Civil Filing Fee and Affidavit of Indigence in Support of Request to proceed In Forma Pauperis with Certificate of Prisoner Trust Fund Account Activity attached re #1 Complaint by Harvey Preston (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/27/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Harvey Preston against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preston #235170 v. Burgess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Preston #235170
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Spencley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Majerczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. McCory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?