Six v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lenaila Rosetta Six
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00841
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Pam McKimens on behalf of defendant Commissioner of Social Security (McKimens, Pam)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/14/2021, answer due 12/13/2021 (eod)
October 1, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (eod)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (eod)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Hoopes, Kenneth)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Lenaila Six (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Hoopes, Kenneth)
September 29, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security (IFP pending) (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Six v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenaila Rosetta Six
Represented By: Kenneth S. Hoopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Pam McKimens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?