Smith #267009 v. Schiebner et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Lee Smith #267009
Defendant: James Schiebner, April MaClaughlin and Heidi Washington
Case Number: 1:2021cv00878
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 11/4/2021 (slk)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (slk)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 4:21-cv-11984; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (slk)
October 14, 2021 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #7 , Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Derrick Lee Smith (slk)
October 13, 2021 Case transferred to Western District of Michigan (slk)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan, Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis (slk) Modified text on 10/14/2021 (slk).
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE regarding parties' responsibility to notify court of address changes (document transferred from the Eastern District of Michigan) (slk)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Mediation Program (document transferred from the Eastern District of Michigan) (slk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand and exhibits A and B (transferred from the Eastern District of Michigan) against All Defendants filed by Derrick Lee Smith #267009 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith #267009 v. Schiebner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Lee Smith #267009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Schiebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April MaClaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?