Throneberry v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Throneberry
Defendant: Kyle Butler, Jack Pieters, Fredrick Straubel, Chelsea Kasul, Ionia County Sheriff's Department, Robert Dow, II, Reed & Hoppes Towing & Recovery and Bob Hoppes, II
Case Number: 1:2021cv00903
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Ryan Throneberry (jlg)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $9.95 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ryan Throneberry re Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case) #8 , Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency) #7 (slk)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Ryan Throneberry consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (slk)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Affidavit and Resident Account Statement submitted by plaintiff Ryan Throneberry to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (slk)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 11/17/2021 (pjw)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 11/24/2021 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of Deficiency Order #5 Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Ryan Throneberry (pjw)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ryan Throneberry re APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #2 , complaint #1 , MOTION for preliminary injunction #3 (pjw)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiff Ryan Throneberry; (pjw)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ryan Throneberry (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Throneberry v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Throneberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Pieters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrick Straubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Kasul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ionia County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dow, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed & Hoppes Towing & Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Hoppes, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?