Reedy Group Inc. v. United States Small Business Administration et al
Plaintiff: Reedy Group Inc.
Defendant: Small Business Administration, Isabella Casillas Guzman, James Rivera, United States of America, United States Small Business Administration and The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00944
Filed: November 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Copy of Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #14 , Notice of Hearing, #15 sent via U.S. Mail to Reedy Group Inc. (slk)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of status conference set for 1/5/2022 at 11:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; all counsel are to appear; the party representative, Ryan Reedy, shall appear at the status conference unless his new counsel has filed an appearance per order #14 (jep)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 motion to withdraw as attorney; status conference set for 1/5/22 at 11:00 a.m.; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jep)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTES of motion hearing re #11 MOTION to withdraw as attorney of record for Plaintiff Reedy Group, Inc., submitted by Matthew J. Hoffer and Zachary M. Youngsma filed by Reedy Group Inc.; held before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (Court Reporter: Genevieve Hamlin) (jep)
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number #11 : motion hearing is set for 12/16/2021 at 2:00 PM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; (jep)
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to withdraw as attorney of record for Plaintiff Reedy Group, Inc., submitted by Matthew J. Hoffer and Zachary M. Youngsma by plaintiff Reedy Group Inc.; (Hoffer, Matthew)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #6 Plaintiff's motion to expedite production of administrative record; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE to attorney Matthew Joseph Hoffer regarding recent filing #7 (mlc)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING EMERGENCY MOTION to expedite Production of Administrative Record #6 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jep)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE re #6 Expedited Consideration No Longer Requested by plaintiff Reedy Group Inc. (Hoffer, Matthew)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of EMERGENCY MOTION to expedite Production of Administrative Record #6 filed by Reedy Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Saleh v. Pompeo, #2 Exhibit B - SVOG Public Report, #3 Certificate of Compliance - W.D. MIch. LCivR 7.1(d)) (Hoffer, Matthew)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION to expedite Production of Administrative Record by plaintiff Reedy Group Inc.; (Hoffer, Matthew)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Isabella Casillas Guzman, James Rivera, The United States of America, United States Small Business Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mlc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Hoffer, Matthew)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reedy Group Inc. (Hoffer, Matthew)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (mlc)
November 8, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Reedy Group Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6590884 (Hoffer, Matthew)
November 8, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Isabella Casillas Guzman, James Rivera, The United States of America, United States Small Business Administration (Summons Not Provided) (mlc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Reedy Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 86 Fed. Reg. 15083 et seq, #2 Exhibit B - SVOG FAQ Jan. 27, 2021, #3 Exhibit C - SVOG FAQ Feb. 5, 2021, #4 Exhibit D - SVOG FAQ Feb. 12, 2021, #5 Exhibit E - SVOG FAQ Feb. 28, 2021, #6 Exhibit F - SVOG FAQ Mar. 5, 2021, #7 Exhibit G - SVOG FAQ Mar. 12, 2021, #8 Exhibit H - SVOG FAQ Mar. 22, 2021, #9 Exhibit I - SVOG FAQ Apr. 6, 2021, #10 Exhibit J - SVOG FAQ Apr. 8, 2021, #11 Exhibit K - SVOG FAQ Apr. 23, 2021, #12 Exhibit L - SVOG FAQ Jul. 22, 2021, #13 Exhibit M - SVOG FAQ Oct. 20, 2021, #14 Exhibit N - SVOG Eligibility Matrix, #15 Exhibit O - Various Pictures of Entertainment District, #16 Exhibit P - Notice of Award SBA Form 1222, #17 Exhibit Q - Aug. 20, 2021 Email Chain, #18 Exhibit R - Voicemail Transcript, #19 Exhibit S - Notice of Filing of Excel Spreadshete of SVOG Recipients as of Oct. 18, 2021, #20 Index of Exhibits) (Hoffer, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reedy Group Inc. v. United States Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reedy Group Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Hoffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Casillas Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?