Wells v. Seid et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Wells
Defendant: Kamil G. Seid and Filla Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00958
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Ionia County 8th Circuit Court, of receipt of remanded case (mlc)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Ionia County 8th Circuit Court (mlc)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REMAND: case remanded to Ionia County 8th Circuit; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (DISREGARD) ORDER DISMISSING CASE per Judge Bell's Order of Permanent Injunction See 1:07-cv-705; the Clerk of the Court is directed to reject Plaintiff's Complaint #2 ; the Court certifies that an appeal would not be taken in good faith; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks) Modified text on 11/19/2021 (mlc).
November 19, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that Order Dismissing Case (no motion), 6 was filed in error and should be disregarded (aks)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to attorney Ceglarek regarding mandatory electronic filing (slk)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE by defendants Filla Trucking, LLC, Kamil G. Seid to Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Eads, John)
November 17, 2021 Copy of Mandatory E-Filing Letter #5 , Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #3 , Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Joseph J. Ceglarek, II (slk) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (slk).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants to show cause by 11/29/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 11, 2021 RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00 for filing fee, paid by attorney John T. Eads, III on behalf of defendants, credit card receipt number AMIWDC-6593308 (jlg)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (mlc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ionia County Circuit Court case number 2021-34328-NI filed by Kamil G. Seid and Filla Trucking, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B Defendant Filla Trucking Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Order Regarding Alternate Service, #4 Exhibit D Defendant Seid Answer to Complaint) (Eads, John) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (mlc).
November 10, 2021 ANSWER to complaint #1 with jury demand as taken from #1 by Filla Trucking, LLC, Kamil G. Seid (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Seid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Wells
Represented By: Joseph J. Ceglarek, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamil G. Seid
Represented By: John T. Eads, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filla Trucking, LLC
Represented By: John T. Eads, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?