Robison v. Nobilis Credit Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Brad Robison
Defendant: Nobilis Credit Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00978
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER requiring appropriate closing documents to be submitted by 2/15/2022; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Agruss, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Nobilis Credit Management, LLC served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021 (Agruss, Michael)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 CORRECTED SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Nobilis Credit Management, LLC (jlg) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (jlg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 CORRECTED NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (jlg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Nobilis Credit Management, LLC (jlg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (jlg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brad Robison (Agruss, Michael) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (jlg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nobilis Credit Management, LLC filed by Brad Robison (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Agruss, Michael) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (jlg)
November 18, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Brad Robison in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6599277 (Agruss, Michael) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robison v. Nobilis Credit Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Robison
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nobilis Credit Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?