Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. v. Opti-Luxx Inc.
Plaintiff: Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc.
Defendant: Opti-Luxx Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01009
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Opti-Luxx Inc. served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/27/2021 (Cunningham, Thomas)
December 2, 2021 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas W. Cunningham on behalf of plaintiff Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Cunningham, Thomas)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Opti-Luxx Inc. (mg) Modified text on 12/1/2021 (mg).
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the filing of a PATENT ACTION (mg)
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (mg)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by plaintiff Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Jakubowski, Matthew)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Jakubowski, Matthew)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Jakubowski, Matthew)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Opti-Luxx Inc. filed by Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A USPN 11,170,673, #2 Exhibit B - USPN D932,930) (Jakubowski, Matthew)
November 30, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6606851 (Jakubowski, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. v. Opti-Luxx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M. Jakubowski
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opti-Luxx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?