Doe v. Calvin University et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Calvin University, Silliman University and Dwight Tenhuisen
Case Number: 1:2021cv01071
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christina Louise Corl on behalf of defendants Calvin University, Dwight Tenhuisen (Corl, Christina)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dwight Tenhuisen, Calvin University as to Dwight Tenhuisen and Calvin University waiver sent on 1/6/2022, answer due 3/7/2022; (Sheridan, Timothy) Modified text on 1/12/2022 (eod)
January 11, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sandra J. Densham on behalf of defendants Calvin University, Dwight Tenhuisen (Densham, Sandra) Modified text on 1/12/2022 (eod)
January 10, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy F. Sheridan on behalf of defendants Calvin University, Dwight Tenhuisen (Sheridan, Timothy)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Calvin University, Silliman University, Dwight Tenhuisen (eod)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Sleight, Allison)
December 22, 2021 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jane Doe in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6624598 (Sleight, Allison)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (eod)
December 21, 2021 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Calvin University, Silliman University, Dwight Tenhuisen (none provided and filing fee due) (eod)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A , #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F1, #7 Exhibit F2, #8 Exhibit G1, #9 Exhibit G2, #10 Exhibit G3, #11 Exhibit G4, #12 Exhibit G5, #13 Exhibit G6, #14 Exhibit G7, #15 Exhibit G8, #16 Exhibit H ) (Sleight, Allison) Modified text on 12/21/2021 (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Calvin University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Sleight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin University
Represented By: Christina Louise Corl
Represented By: Sandra J. Densham
Represented By: Timothy F. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silliman University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Tenhuisen
Represented By: Christina Louise Corl
Represented By: Sandra J. Densham
Represented By: Timothy F. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?